MO SB230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to venue in guardianship and conservatorship proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to venue in guardianship and conservatorship proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 230 (3, A.A., 4, 5 AND 6) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 230 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 230 (3, A.A., 4, 5 AND 6) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 230 (HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 230 (*HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 230 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 230 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 136 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 230 (*HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: SB 230 (*HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17SenateH adopts CCR
2019-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(0886S07.1SR)
2019-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseH distributes CCR (0886S07.1SR)
2019-05-08HouseSenate conferees appointed: Crawford, Emery, Luetkemeyer, Rizzo, Williams
2019-05-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Knight, Kolkmeyer, Patterson, Mitten, Burnett
2019-05-08HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-05-08HouseS refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended, HA 4, HA 5 & HA 6 and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-05-06HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended
2019-05-06HouseHA 6 H offered & adopted (Roberts-77)--(0886S06.14H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 5 H offered & adopted (Mitten)--(0886S06.16H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 4 H offered & adopted (Burnett)--(0886S06.15H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 3, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-06HouseHA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Pollock-123)--(0886S06.21H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 3 H offered (Knight)--(0886S06.11H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(0886S06.12H)
2019-05-06HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(0886S06.10H)
2019-04-30HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-25HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-17HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-17HouseReported Do Pass H Children and Families
2019-04-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Children and Families
2019-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H Children and Families
2019-04-03HouseReferred H Children and Families
2019-03-18HouseH Second Read
2019-03-14HouseH First Read
2019-03-14SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-12SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-12SenatePerfected
2019-03-12SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2019-03-12SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Williams)--(0886S06.01S)
2019-03-12SenateSS for SCS S offered (Crawford)--(0886S.06F)
2019-02-28SenateReported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS
2019-02-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (0886S.04C)
2019-02-13SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 230-Crawford
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1109660
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB230.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/comm/SB230.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB230.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay370314512-532.pdf#519
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/063.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/063.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/063.015.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/063.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/063.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/063.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.040.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.041.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.039.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback