MO SB258 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the membership of the Kansas City School District board of education and changes the election date for board members
Title
Reduces the membership of the Kansas City School District board of education and changes the election date for board members
Sponsors
Sen. Paul LeVota [D] | Rep. Myron Neth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | HCS H defeated |
2013-05-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred H Elections Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-02 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1317S.03C) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 258-LeVota |