MO SB267 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - H defeated motion to override Governor's veto (Curtman)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - H defeated motion to override Governor's veto (Curtman)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the law of other countries
Title
Specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the law of other countries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | H defeated motion to override Governor's veto (Curtman) |
2013-09-11 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Nieves) |
2013-06-03 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Nieves)--(1409S02.01S) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SS S offered (Nieves)--(1409S.02F) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 S withdrawn |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-09 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Dixon)--(1409S01.01S) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 267-Nieves |