MO SB279 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 279, 139 & 345-Onder, with SCS, SS for SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 279, 139 & 345-Onder, with SCS, SS for SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to abortion
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to abortion
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Onder [R] | Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 279, 139 & 345-Onder, with SCS, SS for SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(1576S08.02S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(1576S08.01S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Onder)--(1576S.08F) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 279, 139 & 345) Health and Pensions Committee (1576S.06C) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | S First Read--SB 279-Onder and Emery |