MO SB283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Enacts provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - SB 283 (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - SB 283 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - SB 283 (HA 2) (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - SB 283 (Y: 105 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - SB 283 (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - SB 283 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - SB 283 (HA 2) (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - SB 283 (Y: 105 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - SB 283 (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(1203S05.1SR) |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (1203S05.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Andrews, Wiemann, Mathews, Merideth-80, Wessels |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Hegeman, Wieland, Schatz, Rizzo, Sifton |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-09 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(1203H02.04H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(1203H02.50H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Houghton)--(1203H02.53H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered (Eggleston)--(1203H02.10H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (May)--(1203H02.19H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(1203H02.40H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(1203H02.52H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered (Evans)--(1203H02.48H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roeber)--(1203H02.38H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Chipman)--(1203H02.34H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(1203H02.45H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(1203H02.12H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(1203H02.35H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2017-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 283-Hegeman |