MO SB306 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding education for members of military families
Title
Modifies provisions regarding education for members of military families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 306 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 306 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 306 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 306 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2019-05-16 | House | S concurs in HA 3 |
2019-05-16 | House | S concurs in HA 2 |
2019-05-16 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2019-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2019-05-09 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Lynch)--(1669S02.03H) |
2019-05-09 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Basye)--(1669S02.05H) |
2019-05-09 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Basye)--(1669S02.06H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2019-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2019-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2019-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-03 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (White)--(1669S.02F) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 306-White |