MO SB31 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the actual cost, rather than the value, of the medical care rendered
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the actual cost, rather than the value, of the medical care rendered
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 31 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 31 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 31 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-11 | House | Taken up |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid over |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken up |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-03-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-03-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2017-02-06 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-02 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-02-01 | Senate | SS S adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | SS S offered (Emery)--(0503S.02F) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 31-Emery |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |