MO SB320 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to domestic violence
Title
Modifies provisions relating to domestic violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-05 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-05 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-04 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-22 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-21 | H First Read | |
2011-04-21 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-21 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-21 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight | |
2011-04-14 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Perfected | |
2011-04-13 | SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Lamping)--(1450S.06F) | |
2011-04-13 | SS for SCS S withdrawn | |
2011-04-11 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | SS for SCS S offered (Lamping)--(1450S.05F) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-30 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - (1450S.03C) | |
2011-03-14 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-22 | S First Read--SB 320-Lamping, et al |