MO SB341 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 341-Nasheed, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to offenses involving prostitution when those offenses involve children or persons under the influence of an agent

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to offenses involving prostitution when those offenses involve children or persons under the influence of an agent

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 341-Nasheed, with SCS
2017-05-05SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-04-13SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS
2017-04-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1493S.04C)
2017-02-13SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-02-02SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-24SenateS First Read--SB 341-Nasheed

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback