MO SB36 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating real estate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating real estate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 36 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 36 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 36 SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 123 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17SenateH adopts CCR
2019-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0683S03.1SR)
2019-05-16HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseH distributes CCR (0683S03.1SR)
2019-05-15HouseSenate conferees appointed: Riddle, White, Hough, Sifton, Arthur
2019-05-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Ross, Helms, Billington, Brown(27), Lavender
2019-05-15HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-05-13HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-05-08HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-08HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-08HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Billington)--(0683H02.03H)
2019-05-08HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(0683H02.04H)
2019-05-08HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseHCs Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing
2019-04-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing
2019-04-23HouseExecutive Session Cancelled H Professional Registration and Licensing
2019-04-16HouseHearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing
2019-04-09HouseHearing Cancelled H Professional Registration and Licensing
2019-03-27HouseReferred H Professional Registration and Licensing
2019-02-27HouseH Second Read
2019-02-26HouseH First Read
2019-02-25SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-02-21SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-02-20SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-02-20SenatePerfected
2019-02-14SenateReported from S Professional Registration Committee
2019-02-11SenateVoted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
2019-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 36-Riddle
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback