MO SB363 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-17 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-16 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1462S.02C) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 363-Riddle |