MO SB381 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Innovation Education Campus Fund and recognizes the University of Central Missouri's Missouri Innovation Campus
Title
Creates the Innovation Education Campus Fund and recognizes the University of Central Missouri's Missouri Innovation Campus
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] | Rep. Gary Cross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred H Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-09 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-04-09 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(1417S07.02S) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (1417S.07C) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 381-Kraus |