MO SB42 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to county sheriffs, school protection officers, and creates procedures and policies for unpaid debts to county jails
Title
Modifies provisions relating to county sheriffs, school protection officers, and creates procedures and policies for unpaid debts to county jails
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed (0094S.06S) |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (0094S06.1SR) |
2013-05-15 | House | H submits CCR |
2013-05-13 | House | S conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Parson, Kraus, Chappelle-Nadal, LeVota |
2013-05-13 | House | H conferees appointed: Jones-50, Houghton, Colona |
2013-05-13 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-09 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-09 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wilson)--(0094H05.01H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0094H05.06H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Conway)--(0094H05.08H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Funderburk)--(0094H05.02F) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H defeated |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered (Engler)--(0094H05.03F) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Webber)--(0094H05.01F) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(0094H05.03H) |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-14 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee - (0094S.03C) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 42-Munzlinger |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |