MO SB421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the conveyance of state property
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the conveyance of state property
Sponsors
Sen. John Rizzo [D] | Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 421 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 421 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 421 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 421 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 421 (HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 421 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 421 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 421 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 421 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 421 (HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 421 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Rizzo)--(1876S06.1SR) |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (1876S06.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Rizzo, Hummel, Hoskins, Wasson, Kraus |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Kidd, Engler, Kelley-127, Rowland-29, Anders |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(1876H04.15H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(1876H04.08H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(1876H04.06) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Corrections and Public Institutions |
2017-03-28 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-27 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted (1876S.03C) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1876S.03C) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 421-Rizzo |