MO SB480 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies law with respect to motor vehicles and outboard motor titles
Title
Modifies law with respect to motor vehicles and outboard motor titles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCS H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR H adopted (4472S11.01F) | |
2012-05-17 | H submits CCR | |
2012-05-17 | CCS S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-17 | CCR S offered & adopted (4472S11.1SR) | |
2012-05-17 | S conferees appointed: Stouffer, Kehoe, Engler, McKenna, Wright-Jones | |
2012-05-16 | H conferees appointed: Burlison, Jones-117, Denison, McCreery, Fallert | |
2012-05-16 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2012-05-16 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2012-05-16 | S refuses to concur in HCS#2, as amended | |
2012-05-16 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-16 | HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 9 to HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 2 to HA 9 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(4472L10.53H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Marshall)--(4472L10.52H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 9 to HCS#2 H offered (Gatschenberger)--(4472L10.35H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 8 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Nolte)--(4472L10.41H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 7 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(4472L10.13H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 6 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Brown-116)--(4472L10.06H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 5 to HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(4472L10.38H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 5 to HCS#2 H offered (Guernsey)--(4472L10.01H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 4 to HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 2 to HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Hough)--(4472L10.49H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Korman)--(4472L10.48H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered (Pollock)--(4472L10.27H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 3 to HCS#2 H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HSA 1 for HA 3 to HCS#2 H offered & defeated (McCreery)--(4472L10.08H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 3 to HCS#2 H offered (Denison)--(4472L10.34H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(4472L10.24H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(4472L10.42H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered (Burlison)--(4472L10.39H) | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-09 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-07 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-07 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-02 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Returned to committee of origin H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Voted to retun to committee of origin H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-11 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-08 | H First Read | |
2012-03-08 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Perfected | |
2012-03-05 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-01-25 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (4472S.02C) | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 480-Stouffer | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |