MO SB489 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to weapons
Title
Modifies provisions relating to weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-08 | Hearing Cancelled H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Referred H General Laws Committee | |
2012-03-30 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-29 | H First Read (w/EC) | |
2012-03-29 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected | |
2012-03-27 | SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(4464S.05F) | |
2012-03-22 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-21 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 489 & 637) S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - (4464.03C) | |
2012-03-05 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 489-Munzlinger | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |