MO SB49 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to local sales taxes
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to local sales taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 49 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 49 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 49 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 49 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | S concurs in HA 1, as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (Plocher)--(0432S05.05H) |
2017-05-11 | House | HA 1 H offered (Barnes-60)--(0432S05.03H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-05-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2017-04-28 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-27 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-04-13 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(0432S05.02S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Walsh)--(0432S.05F) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee (0432S.03C) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 49-Walsh |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |