MO SB49 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 49-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 49-Rowden, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the enforcement of judgments and decrees against insurance companies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the enforcement of judgments and decrees against insurance companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 49-Rowden, with SCS |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee with SCS |
2019-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (0528S.02C) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 49-Rowden |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |