MO SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 5-Sater, et al, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 5-Sater, et al, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the initiative and referendum process
Title
Modifies the initiative and referendum process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 5-Sater, et al, with SCS |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0316S.04C) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 5-Sater, et al |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |