MO SB52 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates several provisions relating to suicide awareness and prevention
Title
Creates several provisions relating to suicide awareness and prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 85 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 52 SBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-03-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred H Consent and House Procedure Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy - Consent |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee, with SCS - Consent |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted (0715S.02C) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0715S.02C) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 52-Nasheed |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |