MO SB533 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals to adopt workplace violence prevention plans
Title
Requires hospitals to adopt workplace violence prevention plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 533-Walllingford |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26837996 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB533.pdf |