MO SB550 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Missouri Works and Missouri Works Training programs
Title
Reauthorizes the Missouri Works and Missouri Works Training programs
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (4474S.02C) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 550-Wasson |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB550.pdf |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/comm/SB550.pdf |