MO SB561 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to work requirements for participants in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Title
Modifies the law relating to work requirements for participants in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 561-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB561.pdf |