MO SB570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 570 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 H offered & withdrawn (Reedy)--(3497H07.35H) |
2020-05-14 | House | HA 2 H offered (Eggleston)--(3497S05.12H) |
2020-05-14 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(3497S05.05H) |
2020-05-14 | House | HCS H defeated |
2020-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-27 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-02-03 | House | H Second Read |
2020-01-30 | House | H First Read |
2020-01-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(3497S05.02S) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(3497S.05F) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2020-01-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3497S.03C) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 570-Koenig |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |