MO SB573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3563S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3563S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a petroleum products surcharge and reduces the income tax rate
Title
Imposes a petroleum products surcharge and reduces the income tax rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3563S.03C) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 573-Eigel |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |