MO SB578 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain circuits to appoint an additional court marshal, authorizes an additional judge in certain circuits, excludes firearms from bankruptcy, and establishes the Missouri Commercial Receivership Act
Title
Allows certain circuits to appoint an additional court marshal, authorizes an additional judge in certain circuits, excludes firearms from bankruptcy, and establishes the Missouri Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 578 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 578 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 578 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 578 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 578 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | H Third Read and Passed CCS |
2016-05-10 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-09 | Senate | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-06 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(4539S.04S) |
2016-05-06 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(4539S04.1SR) |
2016-05-05 | House | S conferees appointed: Keaveny, Sifton, Dixon, Emery, Onder |
2016-05-05 | House | H conferees appointed: Jones, Mathews, Miller, Mitten, Colona |
2016-05-05 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference & allow conferees to exceed differences |
2016-05-03 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-04-27 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-27 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater-49)--(4539H03.04H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(4539H03.03H) |
2016-04-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2016-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCAs |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-02-09 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-08 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-03 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(4539S02.01S) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2016-01-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4539S.02C) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 578-Keaveny |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |