MO SB591 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to civil actions, including punitive damages and unlawful merchandising practices
Title
Modifies provisions relating to civil actions, including punitive damages and unlawful merchandising practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 591 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 591 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 591 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 591 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 591 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Constitutional Objection filed in House |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-12 | House | HA 1 offered & defeated (Mitten)--(3061S14.24H) |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-30 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-03-03 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-02 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (White)--(3061S.14F) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (White)--(3061S.06F) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (3061S.04C) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 591-White |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |