MO SB594 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain types of commercial insurance lines from filing requirements with respect to rates, rate plans, modifications, and manuals
Title
Exempts certain types of commercial insurance lines from filing requirements with respect to rates, rate plans, modifications, and manuals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 594 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 43 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 594 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 594 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-04-25 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-25 | House | HA 1 H offered & defeated (Hill)--(4841S01.03H) |
2018-04-18 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 594-Wieland |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |