MO SB597 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 597-Riddle, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 597-Riddle, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to fees for insurance services
Title
Modifies provisions relating to fees for insurance services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: SB 597 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: SB 597 (HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: SB 597 (HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 597-Riddle, with HCS, as amended |
2018-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Roden)--(4177H04.13H) |
2018-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(4177H04.16H) |
2018-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(4177H04.03H) |
2018-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H adopted |
2018-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Lavender)--(4177H04.17H) |
2018-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Henderson)--(4177H04.05H) |
2018-05-08 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wiemann)--(4177H04.07H) |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy |
2018-03-05 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-01 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-20 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Sater)--(4177S03.02S) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | SS S offered (Riddle)--(4177S.03F) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 597-Riddle |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |