MO SB598 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Transportation utility corridor
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Transportation utility corridor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 598 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 598 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-10 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-10 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2018-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended |
2018-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Higdon)--(5089H05.08H) |
2018-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(5089H05.17H) |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight w/HCS |
2018-05-02 | House | Executive Session Conducted H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Utilities |
2018-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Utilities |
2018-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Utilities |
2018-04-11 | House | Hearing Cancelled H Utilities |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Utilities |
2018-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-01 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Munzlinger)--(5089S04.01S) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5089S.04C) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 598-Riddle |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |