MO SB599 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to financial instruments
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to financial instruments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: SB 599 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: SB 599 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Constitutional Objection filed in House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2020-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-04 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2020-05-04 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(3390H04.05H) |
2020-05-04 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Trent)--(3390H04.03H) |
2020-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pike)--(3390H04.04H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-01 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-03-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2020-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2020-03-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2020-02-05 | House | H Second Read |
2020-02-04 | House | H First Read |
2020-02-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (3390S.03C) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 599-Brown |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |