MO SB6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to controlled substances, including the Schedules, medical marijuana, and criminal provisions involving controlled substances
Title
Modifies provisions relating to controlled substances, including the Schedules, medical marijuana, and criminal provisions involving controlled substances
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee vote reconsidered |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted to return to committee of origin |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2019-02-19 | House | H Second Read |
2019-02-18 | House | H First Read |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SCS. as amended, adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0363S03.05S) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0363S03.06S) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Onder)--(0363S03.04S) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(0363S03.01S) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0363S.03C) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 6-Sater |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |