MO SB602 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 602-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 602-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to public sector collective bargaining
Title
Creates new provisions relating to public sector collective bargaining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 602-Onder, with SCS |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4253S.03C) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 602-Onder |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |