MO SB607 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public assistance programs
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public assistance programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 607 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 607 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 116 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 607 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 116 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 607 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(4547S.04F) |
2016-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted --(4547S04.1SR) |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-04-28 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Romine, Hegeman, Schupp, Sifton |
2016-04-27 | House | H conferees appointed: Representatives Haefner, Franklin, Wood, McCreery, Butler |
2016-04-27 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-04-27 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-04-27 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2016-04-27 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & defeated (Carpenter)--(4547H02.27H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(4547H02.01H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(4547H02.30H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick-158)--(4547H02.03H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(4547H02.07H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(4547H02.04H) |
2016-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Children and Families w/HCA 1 |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Children and Families w/Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Children and Families |
2016-02-29 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-25 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 607-Sater |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |