MO SB608 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 608 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCR#2 H adopted |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-12 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed--(4834S.14S) |
2016-05-12 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted--(4834S14.1SR) |
2016-05-12 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Romine, Onder, Schupp, Holsman |
2016-05-12 | House | H conferees appointed: Allen, Haefner, Engler, Mitten, Kendrick |
2016-05-12 | House | H grants further conference |
2016-05-11 | House | S requests further conference |
2016-05-02 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Romine, Onder, Schupp, Holsman |
2016-05-02 | House | H conferees appointed: Allen, Haefner, Engler, Mitten, Kendrick |
2016-05-02 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-04-27 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-04-27 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider H Third Reading Vote Adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | Defeated on H Third Reading |
2016-04-27 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley)--(4834H04.12H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(4834H04.05H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 13 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 1 to HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowden)--(4834H04.56H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered (Jones)--(4834H04.50H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(4834H04.09H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & defeated (Nichols)--(4834H04.40H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4834H04.08H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(4834H04.23H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(4834H04.52H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(4834H04.18H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(4834H04.07H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(4834H04.21H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(4834H04.14H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(4834H04.54H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(4834H04.20H) |
2016-04-27 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Allen)--(4834H04.15H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance w/HCA 1 |
2016-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance w/Amendments |
2016-03-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance |
2016-02-24 | House | Re-referred H Health Insurance |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-02-23 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-22 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(4834S03.10S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SA 3 to SS S offered (Walsh)--(4834S03.06S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(4834S03.01F) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(4834S03.05S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Holsman)--(4834S03.02S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | SS S offered (Sater)--(4834S.03F) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 608-Sater |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |