MO SB610 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits an individual from participating in the supplemental nutrition assistance program if he or she is delinquent in child support
Title
Prohibits an individual from participating in the supplemental nutrition assistance program if he or she is delinquent in child support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 610-Hoskins |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69472620 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB610.pdf |