MO SB617 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 617, 611 & 667) Ways and Means Committee (4085S.19C) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 617-Eigel |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |