MO SB618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - In Conference--SS for SB 618-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - In Conference--SS for SB 618-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to utilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 (*HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 12 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: SB 618 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | In Conference--SS for SB 618-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended |
2020-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-13 | House | H distributes CCR--(4059S07.1SR) |
2020-05-08 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Wallingford, Emery, Cierpiot, Nasheed, Schupp |
2020-05-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Kidd, Hicks, Hansen, Proudie, Washington |
2020-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2020-05-08 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2020-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(4059H06.14H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Andrews)--(4059H06.25H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(4059H06.02H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(059H06.22H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(4059H06.27H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Kelly-141)--(059H06.22H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HCS H adopted--(4059H06.05H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Hill)--(4059H06.32H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HCS H Point of order not well taken |
2020-05-06 | House | Placed on informal calendar |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Haffner)--(4059H06.05H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rone)--(4059H06.24H) |
2020-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kidd)--(4059H06.31H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-01 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-03-10 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-09 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(4059S03.09S) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(4059S03.18S) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Schupp)--(4059S03.14S) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(4059S03.03S) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SS S offered (Wallingford)--(4059S.03F) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 618-Wallingford |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |