MO SB620 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the definition of "surviving spouse" in provisions relating to the merit system
Title
Modifies the definition of "surviving spouse" in provisions relating to the merit system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2020-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2020-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2020-05-01 | House | H Second Read |
2020-04-30 | House | H First Read |
2020-04-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee - Consent |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 620-Wallingford |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |