MO SB635 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to financial institutions, school funds, private roads, real estate appraisal, agricultural education programs, liens, and state purchasing preferences
Title
Modifies the law relating to financial institutions, school funds, private roads, real estate appraisal, agricultural education programs, liens, and state purchasing preferences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | No motion to override Governor's veto | |
2012-07-12 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-05-18 | CCR H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | H submits CCR | |
2012-05-16 | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-05-16 | CCR S offered & adopted (5139S04.1SR) | |
2012-05-14 | H conferees appointed: Phillips, Wells, Smith-150, Mott-Oxford, Nichols | |
2012-05-14 | S conferees appointed: Pearce, Engler, Wasson, Justus, Wright-Jones | |
2012-05-14 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2012-05-10 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2012-05-10 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2012-05-09 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-05-09 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-09 | HA 11 to HCS H offered & defeated (Schneider)--(5139H03.04F) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruzicka)--(5139H03.18H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 9 to HCS H defeated | |
2012-05-09 | HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & defeated (Neth)--(5139H03.13H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 9 to HCS H offered (Wells)--(5139H03.09H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cauthorn)--(5139H03.23H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wells)--(5139H03.10H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(5139H03.07H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-09 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(5139H03.24H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Smith-150)--(5139H03.22H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5139H03.03F) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Leara)--(5139H03.21H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brandom)--(5139H03.16H) | |
2012-05-09 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Phillips)--(5139H03.05F) | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-19 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2012-04-18 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2012-03-19 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-08 | H First Read | |
2012-03-08 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Perfected | |
2012-03-07 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-20 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (5139S.02C) | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-10 | S First Read--SB 635-Pearce |