MO SB636 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the judiciary
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the judiciary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCS H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR H adopted (4054S03.01F) | |
2012-05-18 | CCS S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR S adopted | |
2012-05-17 | H request S take up and pass the CCR | |
2012-05-17 | H refuses to grant further conference | |
2012-05-16 | H submits CCR | |
2012-05-16 | S requests H grant further conference | |
2012-05-16 | S refused to adopt CCR | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn | |
2012-05-16 | CCR S offered (4054S03.1SR) | |
2012-05-15 | S conferees appointed: Keaveny, Justus, Goodman, Dixon, Lamping | |
2012-05-15 | H conferees appointed: Diehl, Cox, Elmer, Hummel, Colona | |
2012-05-15 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2012-05-15 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2012-05-15 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2012-05-14 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-14 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-14 | HA 19 to HCS H offered & defeated (Wells)--(4054L02.24H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(4054L02.01L) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (May)--(4054L02.22H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fuhr)--(4054L02.14H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Higdon)--(4054L02.12H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4054L02.45H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(4054L02.02L) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(4054L02.39H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franz)--(4054L02.05F) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(4054L02.25H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(4054L02.35H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Leara)--(4054L02.32H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Talboy)--(4054L02.21H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(4054L02.47H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(4054L02.02F) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dieckhaus)--(4054L02.19H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (Brandom)--(4054L02.28H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-14 | HA 4 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (White)--(4054L02.51H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 3 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (McGhee)--(4054L02.38H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schoeller)--(4054L02.49H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(4054L02.43H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Cross)--(4054L02.29H) | |
2012-05-14 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Solon)--(4054L02.13H) | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-26 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee | |
2012-04-25 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-30 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-29 | H First Read | |
2012-03-29 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected | |
2012-03-22 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor | |
2012-03-05 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-10 | S First Read--SB 636-Keaveny |