MO SB644 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law regarding certain taxes to fund tourism and convention centers
Title
Modifies provisions of law regarding certain taxes to fund tourism and convention centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-12 | S Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2010-05-12 | S concurs in HA 3 | |
2010-05-12 | S concurs in HA 2 | |
2010-05-12 | S concurs in HA 1 | |
2010-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2010-05-04 | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Nance)--(3322S04.03H) | |
2010-05-04 | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Sutherland)--(3322S04.02H) | |
2010-05-03 | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Guest)--(3322S04.01F) | |
2010-04-26 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-04-26 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Do Pass H Tourism Committee | |
2010-04-15 | Voted Do Pass H Tourism Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Hearing Conducted H Tourism Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred H Tourism Committee | |
2010-02-22 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-18 | H First Read | |
2010-02-18 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Perfected | |
2010-02-15 | SCS S adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-02-08 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3322S.04C) | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 644-Shields | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |