MO SB644 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to unclaimed property
Title
Creates new provisions relating to unclaimed property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 644 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-03 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-03 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 H offered & defeated (Lavendar)--(4999S02.02H) |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-03-05 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-01 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-26 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (4999S.02C) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 644-Cunningham |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |