MO SB66 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to workers' compensation
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to workers' compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: SB 66 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: SB 66 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-08 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-08 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2017-04-20 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (Bahr)--(0250H06.10H) |
2017-04-20 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0250H06.04H) |
2017-04-20 | House | HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Arthur)--(0250H06.12H) |
2017-04-20 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Brown)--(0250H06.11H) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Employment Security |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Employment Security |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Employment Security |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Employment Security |
2017-03-13 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-09 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-09 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0250S03.07S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(0250S03.06S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0250S03.04S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(0250S03.03S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SSA 1 to SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(0250S03.02F) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Walsh)--(0250S03.01F) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0250S03.01S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(0250S.03F) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee, with SCS |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0250S.02C) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 66-Schatz |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |