MO SB663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 663-Schatz, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 663-Schatz, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for an appropriation to cooperate with political subdivisions on land clearance projects related to tourism infrastructure facilities
Title
Allows for an appropriation to cooperate with political subdivisions on land clearance projects related to tourism infrastructure facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 663-Schatz, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-04 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(4918S04.13S) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(4918S.04F) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (4918S.02C) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 663-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |