MO SB673 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to professional registration
Title
Modifies provisions relating to professional registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2020-05-07 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-27 | House | Re-Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2020-03-09 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-05 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-03-03 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee w/SCS |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 673 & 560) Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (3308S.07C) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 673-Brown |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |