MO SB687 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to student transportation and allocation of school funds
Title
Modifies provisions relating to student transportation and allocation of school funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 687 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 687 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: SB 687 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 687 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: SB 687 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-17 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-15 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-15 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Sater) |
2018-05-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | H distributes CCR (4494S06.01F) |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Sater, Romine, Hegeman, Holsman, Sifton |
2018-05-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Rowland(155), Wood, Swan, Kendrick, Morgan |
2018-05-09 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-05-08 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-05-07 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-07 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(4494H02.02H) |
2018-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(4494H02.05H) |
2018-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2018-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2018-04-23 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2018-04-16 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-12 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 687-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |