MO SB688 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the comprehensive state energy plan be reviewed by the Division of Energy by January 1, 2022, and biennially thereafter, and updated if necessary
Title
Requires that the comprehensive state energy plan be reviewed by the Division of Energy by January 1, 2022, and biennially thereafter, and updated if necessary
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 688-Emery |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838111 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB688.pdf |