MO SB697 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred H General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred H General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the time period after which new members of an organization are allowed to manage a bingo game
Title
Reduces the time period after which new members of an organization are allowed to manage a bingo game
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2018-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-09 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-05 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Progress and Development Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 697-Romine |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |