MO SB7 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Science and Innovation Reinvestment Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Science and Innovation Reinvestment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Mayer [R] | Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-10-06 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-10-06 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-10-06 | Constitutional objection filed | |
2011-09-23 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-09-23 | Constitutional objection filed | |
2011-09-23 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-09-23 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-09-23 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-09-23 | HCS H defeated | |
2011-09-23 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Asbury)--(0033L06.09L) | |
2011-09-23 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-09-23 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-09-22 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-09-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-09-22 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-09-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-12 | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-15 | Referred H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-15 | H Second Read | |
2011-09-14 | H First Read | |
2011-09-14 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-09-13 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-09-13 | Perfected | |
2011-09-13 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-09-13 | SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(0033S03.03S) | |
2011-09-13 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Rupp)--(0033S03.02S) | |
2011-09-13 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Richard)--(0033S03.01S) | |
2011-09-12 | SS for SCS S offered (Mayer)--(0033S.03F) | |
2011-09-12 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-09-07 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-09-07 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (0033S.02C) | |
2011-09-07 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-09-07 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-09-06 | S First Read--SB 7-Mayer |